WI SB343 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 85.06 (2) (b) of the statutes; relating to: the rail passenger service assistance and promotion program.
Title
The rail passenger service assistance and promotion program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing held | |
2009-11-20 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-10-09 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-10-09 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb343 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB343.pdf |