WI SB342 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 252.045 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting discrimination based on whether the person has received a COVID-19 vaccine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting discrimination based on whether the person has received a COVID-19 vaccine.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2022-02-11SenateAvailable for scheduling
2022-02-11SenateReport passage without recommendation, pursuant to Senate Rule 27 (4)(a), by Committee on Health, Ayes 2, Noes 2
2022-02-10SenateExecutive action taken
2022-01-12SenatePublic hearing held
2021-06-08SenateRepresentative Edming added as a cosponsor
2021-06-02SenateRepresentative Allen added as a cosponsor
2021-05-24SenateRepresentative Behnke added as a cosponsor
2021-05-14SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2021-05-14SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback