WI SB34 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 299.48 (5); and to create 299.48 (5) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: fire fighting foam containing PFAS and the partial suspension of a rule of the Department of Natural Resources.
Title
Fire fighting foam containing PFAS and the partial suspension of a rule of the Department of Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Referred to committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 18, Noes 14 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Report without recommendation pursuant to s. 227.26 (2)(h), Wisconsin Statutes |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s.227.26(2)(g), Wisconsin Statutes |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced |