WI SB34 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 254.71 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring certain persons to hold certificates of food protection practices in order to operate certain school lunchrooms participating in the National School Lunch Program. (FE)
Title
Requiring certain persons to hold certificates of food protection practices in order to operate certain school lunchrooms participating in the National School Lunch Program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Executive session held |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb34 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB34.pdf |