WI SB332 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-11)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-11)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 347.48 (4) (as) 1. and 347.48 (4) (as) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: use of child safety restraint systems in motor vehicles. (FE)
Title
Use of child safety restraint systems in motor vehicles. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb332 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB332.pdf |