WI SB329 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 45.44 (1) (a) 18., 601.43 (1) (a) and 601.43 (1) (d); and to create 601.31 (1) (z), 601.31 (1) (zb), 601.31 (1) (zc) and chapter 629 of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of public adjusters and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Regulation of public adjusters and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Feyen |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb329 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB329.pdf |