WI SB324 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 30.579 and 30.77 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: veteran boat launch permits. (FE)
Title
Veteran boat launch permits. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. Calvin Callahan [R] |
Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Introduced |