WI SB323 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.12 (1) and 38.23 (1); and to create 36.25 (58) and 38.12 (15) of the statutes; Relating to: designating University of Wisconsin and technical college sports and athletic teams based on the sex of the participants.
Title
Designating University of Wisconsin and technical college sports and athletic teams based on the sex of the participants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Report passage by Committee on Human Services, Children and Families, Ayes 2, Noes 3 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Human Services, Children and Families |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Introduced |