WI SB322 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Public hearing held
Pending: Senate Human Services, Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 118.13 (1); and to create 118.132 of the statutes; Relating to: designating athletic sports and teams operated or sponsored by public schools or private schools participating in a parental choice program based on the sex of the participants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating athletic sports and teams operated or sponsored by public schools or private schools participating in a parental choice program based on the sex of the participants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenatePublic hearing held
2021-05-11SenateRepresentative Steffen added as a cosponsor
2021-05-10SenateRepresentative Knodl added as a cosponsor
2021-04-22SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Human Services, Children and Families
2021-04-22SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback