WI SB320 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 281.36 (3b) (b), 281.36 (3m) (a), 281.36 (6) (a) (intro.) and 281.36 (9) (a) (intro.); and to create 281.36 (4m) of the statutes; Relating to: the discharge of dredged or fill material into artificial wetlands and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Title
The discharge of dredged or fill material into artificial wetlands and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Representative Brostoff added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Wanggaard and Cowles |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb320 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB320.pdf |