WI SB31 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Referred to committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 20, Noes 12
Pending: Senate Labor and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 457.03 (2); and to create 457.03 (2) (a) 1. to 4. and 457.03 (2) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: rules defining unprofessional conduct by marriage and family therapists, professional counselors, and social workers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rules defining unprofessional conduct by marriage and family therapists, professional counselors, and social workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Referred to committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16SenateReferred to committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 20, Noes 12
2021-03-16SenateRead a second time
2021-03-12SenatePlaced on calendar 3-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-03-04SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-03-04SenateReport without recommendation pursuant to s. 227.26 (2)(h), Wisconsin Statutes
2021-03-04SenateJoint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s.227.26(2)(g), Wisconsin Statutes
2021-01-28SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform
2021-01-28SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback