WI SB299 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Published 6-23-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Published 6-23-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 165.76 (1) (f), 304.137 (2) (title) and 304.137 (2); and to create 165.76 (1) (fm) and 304.137 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: submission of human biological specimens to the state crime laboratories.
Title
Submission of human biological specimens to the state crime laboratories.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Senate | Published 6-23-2021 |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 6-22-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 53 |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 6-22-2021 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-06-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-16 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-06-11 | House | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-09 | House | Placed on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-08 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-05-25 | House | Representatives Drake and Stubbs added as cosponsors |
2021-05-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced |