WI SB298 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Published 3-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Published 3-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 97.30 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: allowing dogs on the premises of certain retail food establishments.
Title
Allowing dogs on the premises of certain retail food establishments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Published 3-5-2022 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-4-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 143 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-3-2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Roth |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced |