WI SB298 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-27 - Published 11-28-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-27 - Published 11-28-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create chapter 204 of the statutes; Relating to: creation of a category of business corporation identified as a benefit corporation.
Title
Creation of a category of business corporation identified as a benefit corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-27 | Senate | Published 11-28-2017 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-27-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 77 |
2017-11-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-22-2017 |
2017-11-20 | Senate | LRB correction |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-11-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-09 | House | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2017-11-09 | House | Read |
2017-11-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-11-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Representative Zepnick added as a cosponsor |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Testin |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Introduced |