WI SB297 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 60.30 (4) (a); to amend 17.03 (10), 59.10 (2) (b) and 59.10 (3) (d); and to create 60.30 (4) (a) 2., 61.23 (3) and 62.09 (5) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: terms of office for local government officers.
Title
Terms of office for local government officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-05-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 13 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced |