WI SB297 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Published 1-22-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Published 1-22-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 23.1165 of the statutes; Relating to: making insect repellant available for sale in state parks and state forests. (FE)
Title
Making insect repellant available for sale in state parks and state forests. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | Published 1-22-2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 1-21-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 74 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 1-17-2020 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-01-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on calendar 1-15-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senator Bewley added as a coauthor |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Representative Oldenburg added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Representative Rohrkaste added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Introduced |