WI SB293 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 765.05, 765.08, 765.09 (3) (a), 765.09 (3) (b), 765.12 (2), 765.13, 765.16 (1m) (intro.), 765.19, 765.23, 765.30 (3) (a) and (b) and 765.30 (4) (a); and to create 765.09 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: marriage solemnization requirements and marriage document requirements, issuance, and validity. (FE)
Title
Marriage solemnization requirements and marriage document requirements, issuance, and validity. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-11-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-05-25 | Senate | LRB correction |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced |