WI SB291 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.0602 (4) (c); to amend 66.0602 (2m) (b) 4. and 66.0602 (4) (a); and to create 66.0602 (4) (c) 1. to 4. of the statutes; Relating to: holding a referendum to increase a political subdivision's levy limit. (FE)
Title
Holding a referendum to increase a political subdivision's levy limit. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a coauthor |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-11-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Risser |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb291 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB291.pdf |