WI SB291 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 70.03 (1) and 70.32 (1); and to create 70.32 (1b) of the statutes; Relating to: property tax assessments regarding leased property. (FE)
Title
Property tax assessments regarding leased property. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2017-11-17 | Senate | Representative Anderson added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-13 | Senate | Representative Wachs added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Representative C. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb291 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB291.pdf |