WI SB291 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 281.34 (7); to amend 281.34 (1) (a) (intro.), 281.34 (2), 281.34 (4) (a) (intro.), 281.34 (5) (a), 281.34 (5) (b), 281.34 (5) (c) and 281.34 (5) (d); and to create 281.34 (1) (em), 281.34 (1) (er), 281.34 (1m), 281.34 (2g), 281.34 (4) (am), 281.34 (4g), 281.34 (5) (f), 281.34 (7) (b), 281.34 (7d), 281.34 (7g) and 281.34 (7m) of the statutes; Relating to: approvals for high capacity wells, designation of sensitive resource areas, providing exemptions from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Approvals for high capacity wells, designation of sensitive resource areas, providing exemptions from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb291 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB291.pdf |