WI SB289 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 29.024 (6) (am), 29.182 (7), 29.184 (9), 29.301 (3), 29.561, 29.563 (14) (bn) and 29.563 (14) (c) 5.; and to amend 29.024 (6) (b), 29.024 (6) (d), 29.024 (7), 29.171 (3) (a), 29.171 (3) (b), 29.172 (3), 29.173 (3), 29.182 (4) (g), 29.184 (6g) (c), 29.211 (3), 29.216 (3) (title) and (a), 29.216 (3) (b), 29.217 (3), 29.231 (4) and 29.235 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: back tag requirements. (FE)
Title
Back tag requirements. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Published 3-2-2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-1-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 222 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-29-2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2016-02-09 | House | Read |
2016-02-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 28, Noes 4 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-10-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Introduced |