WI SB287 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 27.01 (9) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: waiver of fees for admission to state parks on Earth Day. (FE)
Title
Waiver of fees for admission to state parks on Earth Day. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced |