WI SB285 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 134.65 (1m); to amend 71.78 (1), 71.78 (4) (b), 71.78 (5), 71.78 (6), 72.06, 77.61 (5) (b) 2., 77.61 (5) (c), 77.61 (5) (d), 78.80 (3), 125.04 (4), 139.11 (4) (a) (intro.), 139.38 (6), 139.44 (2), 139.44 (8) (a), (b) and (c), 139.82 (6), 227.52 (1), 565.17 (5) (a), 565.50 (2), 565.50 (3) and 946.82 (4); and to create 71.78 (1g), 71.78 (4) (v), 71.83 (6), 73.03 (51b), 77.61 (5) (am), 77.61 (5) (b) 15., 125.02 (1c), 125.04 (8m), 125.09 (8), 125.09 (9), 125.112, 125.12 (7), 134.65 (1g), 134.65 (1m) (a) 1., 2. and 3., 134.65 (1m) (b), 134.65 (2m), 134.65 (3m), 139.44 (2m), 139.44 (8) (d), 227.43 (1) (bt), 227.43 (3) (bt), 227.43 (4) (bt), 565.17 (5) (d) and 565.50 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: Department of Revenue enforcement and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Revenue enforcement and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2022-01-28SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Wanggaard
2022-01-26SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Wanggaard
2021-10-26SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard
2021-06-03SenateRepresentative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor
2021-05-25SenatePublic hearing held
2021-05-14SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-04-23SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-04-08SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue
2021-04-08SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback