WI SB285 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Passed on November 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-27 - Published 11-28-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Passed on November 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-27 - Published 11-28-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 180.0701 (2), 180.0702 (3) and 180.0720 (2); to amend 180.0703 (2) (intro.), 180.0705 (1), 180.0705 (4) (a), 180.0706 (2) (intro.), 180.0720 (3) and 180.0720 (4); and to create 180.0701 (2) (b), 180.0702 (3) (b) and 180.0709 of the statutes; Relating to: shareholders' meetings of business corporations.
Title
Shareholders' meetings of business corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate: Refused to reconsider vote by which Senate Bill 285 Passed (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-27 | Senate | Published 11-28-2017 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-27-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 79 |
2017-11-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-22-2017 |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed on calendar 11-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-06-16 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Refused to reconsider vote by which Senate Bill 285 Passed, Ayes 13, Noes 20 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Introduced |