WI SB278 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 196.504 (2g) and 196.504 (2r) of the statutes; Relating to: the use of certain federal funds for broadband expansion grants. (FE)
Title
The use of certain federal funds for broadband expansion grants. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 4-14-2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-14-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Representatives Allen and Schraa added as cosponsors |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Representatives Pronschinske, Dittrich and Dallman added as cosponsors |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Introduced |