WI SB264 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 287.17 (8) (b) 3.; to renumber and amend 287.17 (1) (k), 287.17 (8) (b) 1. and 287.17 (8) (b) 2.; to amend 287.17 (1) (eg) 1. b., 287.17 (1) (eg) 2., 287.17 (1) (np), 287.17 (3) (a) (intro.), 287.17 (3) (e), 287.17 (4) (b) 1., 287.17 (4) (b) 2., 287.17 (4) (b) 3., 287.17 (4) (d) (intro.), 287.17 (5) (a) 1. a., 287.17 (5) (a) 1. b., 287.17 (5) (a) 1. c., 287.17 (5) (b), 287.17 (7) (a) 1. (intro.), 287.17 (7) (a) 2., 287.17 (7) (b), 287.17 (8) (a) 1. (intro.), 287.17 (8) (a) 2., 287.17 (8) (c) 4., 287.17 (9m), 287.17 (10) (d) (intro.), 287.17 (10) (j) and 287.17 (10) (k); and to create 287.17 (1) (k) 1., 287.17 (1) (k) 2., 287.17 (1) (k) 3., 287.17 (1) (pg), 287.17 (4) (b) (intro.), 287.17 (4) (be), 287.17 (8) (b) 1m., 2m., 3m., 4. and 5. and 287.17 (10) (m) of the statutes; Relating to: changes to the electronic waste recycling program and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Changes to the electronic waste recycling program and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Miller and Cowles |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Representative Gruszynski added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb264 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB264.pdf |