WI SB260 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.9273 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting performance of and funding or providing property for abortions and other services by certain employees and entities.
Title
Prohibiting performance of and funding or providing property for abortions and other services by certain employees and entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Report passage by Committee on Human Services, Children and Families, Ayes 2, Noes 3 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Human Services, Children and Families |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Introduced |