WI SB26 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 6.275 (1) (f), 6.32 (4), 6.33 (4), 6.33 (5) (a) 1., 6.36 (1) (d), 6.36 (1) (e), 6.47 (6), 6.47 (7) (b), 6.48 (1) (d), 6.48 (2) (b), 6.50 (2), 6.50 (2g), 6.50 (2r) (g), 6.50 (3), 6.50 (4), 6.50 (5), 6.50 (6), 6.50 (7), 6.50 (10), 6.56 (3), 6.56 (4) and 7.23 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: removing ineligible voters from the official voter registration list. (FE)
Title
Removing ineligible voters from the official voter registration list. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-19 | Senate | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2023-07-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Government Operations and rereferred to committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Representative Kurtz added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Representative Neylon added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Representative Rozar added as a cosponsor |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Introduced |