WI SB26 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 50-6)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Published 7-10-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 632.866 of the statutes; Relating to: step therapy protocols for prescription drug coverage and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Step therapy protocols for prescription drug coverage and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10SenatePublished 7-10-2019
2019-07-10SenateReport approved by the Governor on 7-9-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 12
2019-07-09SenatePresented to the Governor on 7-9-2019
2019-06-25SenateReport correctly enrolled
2019-06-18SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2019-06-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-06-18HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2019-06-18HouseRules suspended
2019-06-18HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-06-18HouseRead a second time
2019-06-18HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2019-06-13HousePlaced on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-06-10HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2019-06-05HouseReceived from Senate
2019-06-05SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-06-05SenateRead a third time and passed
2019-06-05SenateRules suspended
2019-06-05SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-06-05SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2019-06-05SenateRead a second time
2019-06-03SenatePlaced on calendar 6-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-05-07SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-05-07SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-05-07SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-05-07SenateExecutive action taken
2019-04-17SenateSenator Bewley added as a coauthor
2019-04-17SenatePublic hearing held
2019-03-27SenateRepresentative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor
2019-03-26SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling
2019-03-07SenateRepresentative Sinicki added as a cosponsor
2019-02-08SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-08SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback