WI SB258 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.255 (3) (dk) and 115.449 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a grant program to support after-school and out-of-school-time programs, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating a grant program to support after-school and out-of-school-time programs, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Representative Kurtz added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb258 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB258.pdf |