WI SB257 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 946.69 (title); and to create 946.69 (2) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: impersonating a public officer, public employee, or employee of a utility and providing a penalty.
Title
Impersonating a public officer, public employee, or employee of a utility and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Representative Anderson added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Representatives Bowen and Steffen added as cosponsors |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senator Ringhand added as a coauthor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senator Bewley added as a coauthor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Introduced |