WI SB254 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on October 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-18 - Published 10-16-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 70.511 (2) (a), 74.35 (5) (c) and 74.37 (4) (b); and to create 101.643 and 893.38 of the statutes; Relating to: extension of certain approvals and occupancy permits under the uniform dwelling code, extension of certain approvals that are subject to administrative, judicial, or appellate proceedings, waiver of interest and penalties on late 2021 property tax payments, and waiver of the timely payment requirement for filing certain property tax claims. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extension of certain approvals and occupancy permits under the uniform dwelling code, extension of certain approvals that are subject to administrative, judicial, or appellate proceedings, waiver of interest and penalties on late 2021 property tax payments, and waiver of the timely payment requirement for filing certain property tax claims. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-18SenatePublished 10-16-2021
2021-10-18SenateReport approved by the Governor on 10-15-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 80
2021-10-15SenatePresented to the Governor on 10-15-2021 by directive of the Majority Leader
2021-10-08SenateReport correctly enrolled
2021-09-29SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2021-09-28HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-09-28HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2021-09-28HouseRules suspended
2021-09-28HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-09-28HouseRead a second time
2021-09-28HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2021-09-23HousePlaced on calendar 9-28-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-09-22HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2021-06-23HouseReceived from Senate
2021-06-23SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-06-23SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 0
2021-06-23SenateRules suspended
2021-06-23SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-06-23SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 3 adopted
2021-06-23SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 2 withdrawn and returned to author
2021-06-23SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
2021-06-23SenateRead a second time
2021-06-23SenateRepresentative Allen added as a cosponsor
2021-06-22SenatePlaced on calendar 6-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-06-22SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Senator Feyen
2021-06-09SenateReferred to committee on Senate Organization
2021-06-09SenateRead a second time
2021-06-08SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Feyen
2021-06-04SenatePlaced on calendar 6-9-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-05-11SenateReferred to committee on Senate Organization
2021-05-11SenateRead a second time
2021-05-11SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen
2021-05-10SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-05-07SenatePlaced on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-05-07SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-05-07SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Economic and Workforce Development, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2021-05-07SenateExecutive action taken
2021-05-05SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-04-12SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-04-12SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-04-07SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-04-07SenatePublic hearing held
2021-03-31SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Economic and Workforce Development
2021-03-31SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb254
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2021/REG/SB254.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/enrolledbills/2021/REG/SB254.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/acts/2021/80.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB254-SSA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB254-SSA2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB254-SSA3.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/fe/sb254/sb254_dor.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/records/senate/economic_and_workforce_development/1615329.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/fe/sb254/sb254_dnr.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/fe/sb254/sb254_dot.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/fe/sb254/sb254_dsps.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcamendmentmemos/2021/REG/SB254.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcactmemos/2021/REG/Act%2080.pdf
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/sv0093

Bill Comments

feedback