WI SB252 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Published 3-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Published 3-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.1105 (6) (a) 19., 66.1105 (6) (am) 2. n. and 66.1105 (6) (am) 2. o. of the statutes; Relating to: extending the time during which tax increments may be allocated and expenditures for project costs may be made for Tax Incremental District Number 2 in the city of Wisconsin Dells and extending the time during which expenditures for project costs may be made for Tax Incremental District Number 3 in the city of Wisconsin Dells.
Title
Extending the time during which tax increments may be allocated and expenditures for project costs may be made for Tax Incremental District Number 2 in the city of Wisconsin Dells and extending the time during which expenditures for project costs may be made for Tax Incremental District Number 3 in the city of Wisconsin Dells.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Rep. Alex Dallman [R] | Rep. Tony Kurtz [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Published 3-5-2022 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-4-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 142 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-3-2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-25 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-17 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 94, Noes 0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-17 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-17-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Introduced |