WI SB244 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 1.15 of the statutes; Relating to: playing or singing the national anthem at certain sporting events.
Title
Playing or singing the national anthem at certain sporting events.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Representative Schraa added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Representatives Brooks and Steffen added as cosponsors |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced |