WI SB244 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 17.26 (2) and 17.26 (4); to renumber and amend 17.26 (intro.) and 17.26 (1); to amend 17.26 (3) and 120.42 (3); and to create 17.26 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: allowing a school board president to fill certain vacancies on a school board of a common, union high, or unified school district.
Title
Allowing a school board president to fill certain vacancies on a school board of a common, union high, or unified school district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-09-21 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1) |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb244 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB244.pdf |