WI SB238 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 118.07 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: posting the child abuse and neglect reporting hotline in school buildings. (FE)
Title
Posting the child abuse and neglect reporting hotline in school buildings. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2022-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-03 | House | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-12-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2021-05-24 | House | Representative James added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced |