WI SB237 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Published 6-23-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 114.045 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: operation of drones over correctional institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Operation of drones over correctional institutions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23SenatePublished 6-23-2021
2021-06-23SenateReport approved by the Governor on 6-22-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 52
2021-06-22SenatePresented to the Governor on 6-22-2021
2021-06-17SenateReport correctly enrolled
2021-06-17SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2021-06-16HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-06-16HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2021-06-16HouseRules suspended
2021-06-16HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-06-16HouseRead a second time
2021-06-16HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2021-06-11HouseRepresentative Steffen added as a cosponsor
2021-06-09HousePlaced on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-06-08HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2021-05-25HouseRepresentative Drake added as a cosponsor
2021-05-11HouseReceived from Senate
2021-05-11SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-05-11SenateRead a third time and passed
2021-05-11SenateRules suspended
2021-05-11SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-05-11SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2021-05-11SenateRead a second time
2021-05-07SenatePlaced on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-05-07SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-05-07SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2021-05-07SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2021-05-06SenateExecutive action taken
2021-04-29SenatePublic hearing held
2021-04-22SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen
2021-03-24SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2021-03-24SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback