WI SB234 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.370 (4) (na) of the statutes; Relating to: biomanipulations to improve the water quality of lakes and impoundments and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Biomanipulations to improve the water quality of lakes and impoundments and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Representative James added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced |