WI SB231 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 115.385 (4) and 118.57 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: providing information about educational options offered in a school district.
Title
Providing information about educational options offered in a school district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic and Workforce Development |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced |