WI SB231 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 196.491 (3e) (ag); to amend 196.491 (title), 196.491 (3e) (title), 196.491 (3e) (am) and 196.491 (3e) (b); and to create 196.491 (3e) (ag) 1., 196.491 (3e) (ag) 3. and 196.491 (3e) (ag) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: conveying interests in local government land for construction of natural gas lines. (FE)
Title
Conveying interests in local government land for construction of natural gas lines. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Roth [R] | Rep. Thomas Weatherston [R] | Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] |
Rep. John Macco [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Representative Genrich added as a cosponsor |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb231 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB231.pdf |