WI SB230 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Published 2-5-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Published 2-5-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.19 (3) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: teacher preparatory programs and granting rule-making authority.
Title
Teacher preparatory programs and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Published 2-5-2020 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-4-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 84 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 1-30-2020 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-01-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-07 | House | Representative C. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a coauthor |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-07-12 | Senate | Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Representatives Kitchens and Vruwink added as cosponsors |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Introduced |