WI SB223 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 15.91; and to create 15.91 (2) of the statutes; relating to: composition of the Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System.
Title
Composition of the Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 | |
2010-05-24 | Placed on calendar 5-25-2010 pursuant to Joint Rule 82(2)(a) | |
2009-12-14 | Report vetoed by the Governor on 12-11-2009 | |
2009-12-08 | Presented to the Governor on 12-8-2009 | |
2009-11-12 | Report correctly enrolled on 11-12-2009 | |
2009-11-06 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-05 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 59, Noes 34 | |
2009-11-05 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-05 | Representative Hilgenberg added as a cosponsor | |
2009-11-05 | Read a second time | |
2009-11-05 | Rules suspended and taken up | |
2009-11-05 | Read | |
2009-11-05 | Received from Senate | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-05 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-11-05 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-05 | Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-11-05 | Read a second time | |
2009-11-04 | LRB correction | |
2009-11-04 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Lassa | |
2009-11-04 | Placed on calendar 11-5-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-09-22 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-09-22 | Report passage recommended by committee on Agriculture and Higher Education, Ayes 4, Noes 1 | |
2009-09-22 | Executive action taken | |
2009-08-11 | Public hearing held | |
2009-06-02 | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture and Higher Education | |
2009-06-02 | Introduced |