WI SB22 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-14)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-14)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 125.51 (3) (a), 125.51 (3) (am) and 125.51 (3) (b); and to create 125.02 (20g) of the statutes; Relating to: the retail sale of intoxicating liquor by the glass for consumption away from the licensed premises.
Title
The retail sale of intoxicating liquor by the glass for consumption away from the licensed premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Representatives Edming and Doyle added as cosponsors |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Representative Spiros added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Representative Macco added as a cosponsor |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced |