WI SB219 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.0404 (4e) of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing a political subdivision to impose setback requirements for certain mobile service support structures. (FE)
Title
Authorizing a political subdivision to impose setback requirements for certain mobile service support structures. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Representative Vruwink added as a cosponsor |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senator Craig added as a coauthor |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections and Utilities |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb219 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB219.pdf |