WI SB216 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 454.20 (2); and to create 454.20 (11m) and 454.20 (12m) of the statutes; Relating to: practicing hair braiding without a license. (FE)
Title
Practicing hair braiding without a license. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Representative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Introduced |