WI SB214 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 8.20 (8) (am); to amend 5.25 (2), 5.84 (1), 7.15 (1) (cm), 7.52 (1) (a), 7.52 (2), 7.52 (3) (a), 7.52 (4) (a) and 8.20 (8) (a); and to create 6.19, 7.52 (1) (d) to (g) and 7.52 (10) of the statutes; Relating to: early canvassing of absentee ballots, issuance of presidential ballots, combined polling places, timeline for sending or transmitting absentee ballots, nomination papers for certain independent candidates, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early canvassing of absentee ballots, issuance of presidential ballots, combined polling places, timeline for sending or transmitting absentee ballots, nomination papers for certain independent candidates, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15HouseFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2022-03-10HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2022-02-23HouseFiscal estimate received
2022-02-23HouseReceived from Senate
2022-02-22SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2022-02-22SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 13
2022-02-22SenateRules suspended
2022-02-22SenateOrdered to a third reading
2022-02-22SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2022-02-22SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 21, Noes 12
2022-02-22SenateRead a second time
2022-02-22SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Carpenter, Smith, Agard and Ringhand
2022-02-21SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stafsholt
2022-02-18SenatePlaced on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2022-02-18SenateFiscal estimate requested from the Legislative Fiscal Bureau, by the committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 96 (1), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2022-02-01SenateRepresentative Brooks added as a cosponsor
2021-06-03SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-06-03SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2021-06-03SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2021-05-27SenateExecutive action taken
2021-05-24SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stafsholt
2021-05-20SenateRepresentative Plumer added as a cosponsor
2021-05-19SenatePublic hearing held
2021-05-11SenateRepresentative Steffen added as a cosponsor
2021-03-16SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics
2021-03-16SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb214
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2021/REG/SB214.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB214-SA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB214-SSA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB214-SSA1-SA1.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcamendmentmemos/2021/REG/SB214.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/records/senate/elections_election_process_reform_and_ethics/1620795.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/records/assembly/rules/1674242.pdf
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/sv0235
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/sv0236

Bill Comments

feedback