WI SB213 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 5.06 (2), 971.19 (12) and 971.223 (1); and to create 12.14 of the statutes; Relating to: actions for violations of elections laws.
Title
Actions for violations of elections laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-15-2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-03-15 | Senate | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate, Ayes 20, Noes 11 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Point of order that Senate Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 was not germane well taken |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Senators Larson, Carpenter, Johnson, Agard, Smith, Bewley, Ringhand, Erpenbach, Wirch and Pfaff |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:45 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Judiciary and referred to committee on Rules pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2022-02-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2021-12-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary |
2021-11-16 | House | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 11 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-14-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Stroebel and Bernier |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Introduced |