WI SB212 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-10)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-10)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 125.68 (4) (c) 3m. of the statutes; Relating to: closing hours for retail sales by wineries.
Title
Closing hours for retail sales by wineries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Representative Kahl added as a cosponsor |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb212 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB212.pdf |