WI SB207 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 7.30 (3) (a) and 12.60 (1) (a); and to create 7.30 (7), 12.085 and 12.13 (3) (zp) of the statutes; Relating to: private resources used for election administration, appointment of election officials, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private resources used for election administration, appointment of election officials, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseReceived from Senate
2021-04-14SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-04-14SenateRead a third time and passed
2021-04-14SenateRules suspended
2021-04-14SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-04-14SenateSenate Amendment 2 adopted
2021-04-14SenateRead a second time
2021-04-13SenatePlaced on calendar 4-14-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-04-13SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-04-13SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2021-04-13SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2021-04-13SenateReport introduction of Senate Amendment 2 by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2021-04-13SenateExecutive action taken
2021-04-08SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-04-08SenatePublic hearing held
2021-04-06SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
2021-03-18SenateSenator Wimberger added as a coauthor
2021-03-16SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics
2021-03-16SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback