WI SB204 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-08-10 - Report vetoed by the Governor on 8-10-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 6.24 (4) (c), 6.86 (2m), 6.87 (4) (b) 2. and 6.87 (4) (b) 3.; to renumber and amend 6.86 (1) (ar); to amend 6.18, 6.30 (5), 6.86 (1) (a) 3., 6.86 (1) (ac), 6.86 (1) (b), 6.86 (2) (a), 6.86 (2) (b), 6.87 (1), 6.87 (2), 6.87 (4) (b) 1., 6.87 (4) (b) 5., 6.875 (3) (a), 6.875 (4) (a) and 7.15 (1) (j); and to create 6.86 (1) (as), 6.86 (2) (am), 6.86 (8), 6.88 (4) and 7.15 (1) (jj) of the statutes; Relating to: absentee ballot applications, unsolicited mailing or transmission of absentee ballot applications and absentee ballots, canvassing absentee ballots, electronic voter registration, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee ballot applications, unsolicited mailing or transmission of absentee ballot applications and absentee ballots, canvassing absentee ballots, electronic voter registration, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics (Y: 11 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-10SenateReport vetoed by the Governor on 8-10-2021
2021-08-05SenatePresented to the Governor on 8-5-2021
2021-06-28SenateReport correctly enrolled
2021-06-22SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2021-06-22HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-06-22HouseRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 60, Noes 38
2021-06-22HouseRules suspended
2021-06-22HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-06-22HouseRead a second time
2021-06-22HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2021-06-16HousePlaced on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-06-15HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2021-06-10HouseReceived from Senate
2021-06-09SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-06-09SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 18, Noes 14
2021-06-09SenateRules suspended
2021-06-09SenatePlaced on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 6-9-2021
2021-06-09SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-06-09SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 18, Noes 14
2021-06-09SenateRefused to refer to committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 11, Noes 21
2021-06-09SenateRead a second time
2021-06-08SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
2021-06-04SenatePlaced on calendar 6-9-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-06-03SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-06-03SenateReport passage by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 2, Noes 3
2021-05-27SenateExecutive action taken
2021-05-20SenateRepresentative Plumer added as a cosponsor
2021-05-11SenateRepresentative Steffen added as a cosponsor
2021-05-03SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
2021-04-23SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-04-15SenatePublic hearing held
2021-03-16SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics
2021-03-16SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb204
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2021/REG/SB204.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/enrolledbills/2021/REG/SB204.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB204-SA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB204-SSA1.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/records/senate/elections_election_process_reform_and_ethics/1611501.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcamendmentmemos/2021/REG/SB204.pdf
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/sv0076
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/sv0077
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/sv0085
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/av0090

Bill Comments

feedback